NH HB518 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 172; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 172; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing certain statutes concerning reimbursement of cost of care by inmates.
Title
Repealing certain statutes concerning reimbursement of cost of care by inmates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 172; Eff: 09/08/2019 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1655s (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 11 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1655s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sen. Chandley Floor Amendment # 2019-1655s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/25/2019; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 5 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 18 |