NH HB531 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the delivery of absentee ballots cast by elderly or disabled citizens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the delivery of absentee ballots cast by elderly or disabled citizens.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2216s (Rep. Moynihan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2216s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2216s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2216s, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/25/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0573h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 6
2019-03-07HouseAmendment # 2019-0573h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 6
2019-02-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0573h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4
2019-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback