NH HB532 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2851h (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to payment for earned but unused vacation or personal time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to payment for earned but unused vacation or personal time.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2851h (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar)
2019-10-30HouseExecutive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-10-10HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-09-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-08-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 08/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-02-06HouseRetained in Committee
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback