NH HB533 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to training for servers of alcohol.
Title
Relative to training for servers of alcohol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 4 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 3 |
2019-02-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-07 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 18 |