NH HB536 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adding biometric information to the consumer protection act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding biometric information to the consumer protection act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-25SenateHearing: 04/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 62
2019-03-19HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Warden) 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 2
2019-03-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5
2019-03-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback