NH HB539 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 262; Eff: 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 262; Eff: 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the implementation of Accessible Ballots.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the implementation of Accessible Ballots.
Sponsors
Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Rep. Lisa Bunker [D] | Rep. Julie Gilman [D] | Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] |
Rep. Gerald Ward [D] | Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 262; Eff: 07/19/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1867s (Rep. Carson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 10 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1867s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1867s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1867s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0302h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 28 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0302h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 28 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0302h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 10 |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 19 |