NH HB543 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Retained Bill - Continued Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Retained Bill - Continued Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to biomass combined heat and electricity facilities.
Title
Relative to biomass combined heat and electricity facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Rep. Frank Holden [R] | Rep. Naida Kaen [D] |
Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] | Rep. William Remick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-26 | House Retained Bill - Continued Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-10-11 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-10-11 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/25/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-08-18 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/13/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301-303 | |
2011-04-12 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/26/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302-304 | |
2011-03-02 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.825 | |
2011-02-16 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 11, PG. 190 |