NH HB545 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-162 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-162 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting law enforcement officers from questioning a minor at school without a parent or guardian present.
Title
Prohibiting law enforcement officers from questioning a minor at school without a parent or guardian present.
Sponsors
Rep. David Love [R] | Rep. Barbara Comtois [R] | Rep. Elaine French [D] | Rep. Jason Janvrin [R] |
Rep. Rene Nunez [R] | Rep. Bob Greene [R] | Rep. William Fowler [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - ITL (Y: 207 N: 162 NV: 6 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-162 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 19 |
2019-02-28 | House | Special Order to 03/07/2019 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 62 |
2019-02-27 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Horn) 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 2 |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 5 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 19 |