NH HB549 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB549
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 292; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 292; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to beverage vendor fees.
Title
Relative to beverage vendor fees.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0153s (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Re-refer to committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0153s (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Re-refer to committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 292; Eff. 8/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 1980c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1980c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-1980c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Innis, French, Lasky; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Innis Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-03-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Biggie, Fromuth, Williams 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 1 |
2018-03-21 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 0153s and Requests CofC (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0153s, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0153s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0153s, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 18Y-5N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/11/2017; Senate Calendar 22 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0443h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 15 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment # 2017-0443h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 15 |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0443h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB549 (Carry Over) 2017-05-11 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16