NH HB554 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB554
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the duty of the moderator to verify the device count.
Title
Relative to the duty of the moderator to verify the device count.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Edith DesMarais [D] | Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] | Rep. David Huot [D] |
Rep. William Pearson [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-09-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-02-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB554 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)