NH HB563 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB563
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2858h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2858h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the fees for failing to register a motor vehicle.
Title
Relating to the fees for failing to register a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2858h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/05/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 20 |
Same As/Similar To
HB563 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2858h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)