NH HB581 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-94 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-94 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment of membership dues for professional organizations on behalf of employees of municipalities and school districts.
Title
Relative to payment of membership dues for professional organizations on behalf of employees of municipalities and school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - ITL (Y: 252 N: 94 NV: 12 Abs: 42) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-94 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 8 |
2019-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0134h (NT) |
2019-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 22 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 21 |