NH HB582 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2660e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the regional greenhouse gas initiative cap and trade program for controlling carbon dioxide emissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the regional greenhouse gas initiative cap and trade program for controlling carbon dioxide emissions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - Conference Committee Report (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 215 N: 133 NV: 22 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2660e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-07-09SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2660e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2555c; Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Adopted; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Warden) 06/27/2019
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2555c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-20SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2555c; 06/27/2019
2019-06-18SenateConferee Change; Senator Watters Replaces Senator Bradley; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/18/2019 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-06-11SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Fuller Clark, Feltes, Bradley; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-11SenateSen. Fuller Clark Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Backus, Saunderson, McWilliams, Mann 06/06/2019
2019-06-10HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1892s and 2019-1987s and Requests CofC (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-1892s, and 2019-1987s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-1987s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1892s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1892s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-03SenateHearing: 04/09/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0795h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 215-133 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 33
2019-03-20HouseAmendment # 2019-0795h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 33
2019-03-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0795h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 34
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=594&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB582
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=568&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=568
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=568
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=134&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0582&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB582&ddlsponsors=&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=143&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0582&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB582&ddlsponsors=&lsr=594
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=225&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0582&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB582&ddlsponsors=&lsr=594

Bill Comments

feedback