NH HB590 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB590
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0898h (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0898h (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the exemption for federally chartered banks under the consumer protection act.
Title
Repealing the exemption for federally chartered banks under the consumer protection act.
Sponsors
Rep. David Luneau [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0898h (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 21 |
Same As/Similar To
HB590 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0898h (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)