NH HB591 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 216; Eff: 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 216; Eff: 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amending the laws governing OHRVs and snowmobiles.
Title
Amending the laws governing OHRVs and snowmobiles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 216; Eff: 09/10/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1858s (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 11 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1858s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1858s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1858s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0975h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 31 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0975h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 31 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0975h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 12 |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-02-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/08/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 21 |