NH HB593 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - House Retained Bill - Rescheduled Executive Session 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - House Retained Bill - Rescheduled Executive Session 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to video lottery and table gaming.
Title
Relative to video lottery and table gaming.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Rep. Edmond Gionet [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-20 | House Retained Bill - Rescheduled Executive Session 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-10-04 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/26/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-10-04 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/11/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-09-29 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 12:30 PM)== | |
2011-09-29 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-09-20 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-09-19 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-09-06 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/20/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-06-02 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/7/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-28 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.826 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 11, PG. 192 |