NH HB603 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB603
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to procedures for apportioning electoral districts.
Title
Relative to procedures for apportioning electoral districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Peter Somssich [D] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] |
Rep. Ryan Buchanan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 38 |
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 6 |
2019-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-02-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 21 |
Same As/Similar To
HB603 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)