NH HB604 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2778h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2778h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the procedures for approval of plans, specifications, and costs of school building construction or renovation.
Title
Relative to the procedures for approval of plans, specifications, and costs of school building construction or renovation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-26 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2778h | |
2011-10-26 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2778h for Jan 4 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) | |
2011-10-04 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/18/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 (If Necessary Continued 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207) | |
2011-09-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-09-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-24 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823 | |
2011-02-18 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/15/2011 4:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Education; House Journal 11, PG. 193 |