NH HB608 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB608
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the formula for determining funding for an adequate education.
Title
Relative to the formula for determining funding for an adequate education.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Rep. Skip Rollins [R] |
Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Walter Spilsbury [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-02-18 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92930919261 |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2021 12:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99866065403 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 56 |
Same As/Similar To
HB608 (Carry Over) 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207