NH HB614 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 263; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 263; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing penalties and fines for air pollution and water pollution.
Title
Increasing penalties and fines for air pollution and water pollution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 247 N: 104 NV: 19 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 293 N: 57 NV: 20 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 247 N: 104 NV: 19 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 293 N: 57 NV: 20 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 263; Eff: 01/01/2020 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1990s (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 13 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1990s, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment # 2019-1990s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0791h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 247-104 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 36 |
2019-03-20 | House | Amendment # 2019-0791h (NT): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 293-57 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 36 |
2019-03-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0791h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 34 |
2019-02-27 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-02-20 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 22 |