NH HB627 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 296; Eff: 09/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 296; Eff: 09/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exceptions from certain pharmacy requirements for veterinarians.
Title
Relative to exceptions from certain pharmacy requirements for veterinarians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 296; Eff: 09/27/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2528e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 55 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2528e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2211s (Rep. Goley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 4 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2211s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2211s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2211s, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Hearing: 05/08/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0396h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 12 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0396h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 12 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0396h (NT) for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 9 |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 22 |