NH HB628 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB628
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a family and medical leave insurance program.
Title
Relative to a family and medical leave insurance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-11-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2481h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-09-13 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-04-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-04-17 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 04/19/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-02-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB628 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate