NH HB628 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB628

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a family and medical leave insurance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a family and medical leave insurance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Reconsider (Y: 161 N: 169 NV: 28 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - House - OTP (Y: 171 N: 162 NV: 25 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 156 N: 175 NV: 27 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - House - Table (Y: 164 N: 168 NV: 26 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 186 N: 164 NV: 13 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 208 N: 141 NV: 14 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - ITL (Y: 168 N: 178 NV: 17 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2018-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 183 N: 151 NV: 26 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateRefer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-17SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-29SenateHearing: 04/05/2018, Room 103, State House, 02:30 pm or immediately following session; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-28SenateIntroduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-22HouseReconsider HB 628 (Rep. White): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 161-169 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 41
2018-03-22HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 171-162 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 39
2018-03-22HouseAmendment # 2018-1111h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 156-175 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 37
2018-03-22HouseLay HB 628 on Table (Rep. Kurk): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 164-168 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 35
2018-03-15HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1102h
2018-03-15HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1111h (NT) for 03/21/2018 (Vote 15-11; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 19
2018-03-15House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-03-12House==RESCHEDULED== Division I Work Session: 03/14/2018 10:05 am Legislative Office Building 212
2018-03-05House==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 03/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2018-03-02House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-02-21HouseDivision I Work Session: 02/27/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Finance 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 25
2018-02-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0225h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-164 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 23
2018-02-08HouseAmendment # 2018-0225h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 208-141 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 20
2018-02-08HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-178 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 18
2018-01-31HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0225h
2018-01-31HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 20
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 01/31/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-11HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2018 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 43
2018-01-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2481h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-151 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 42
2018-01-09HouseAmendment # 2017-2481h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 39
2018-01-03HouseSpecial Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection House Journal 1 P. 104
2017-11-15HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-11-15HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2481h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar)
2017-10-11HouseExecutive Session: 10/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2017-09-13HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2017-04-19HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2017-04-17HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 04/19/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2017-02-08HouseRetained in Committee
2017-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 02/07/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2017-01-24HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 22

Same As/Similar To

HB628 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=16&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB628
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=37&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=37
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA2&id=37
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=27&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0628&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB628&ddlsponsors=&lsr=16
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=28&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0628&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB628&ddlsponsors=&lsr=16
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=29&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0628&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB628&ddlsponsors=&lsr=16
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=30&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0628&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB628&ddlsponsors=&lsr=16
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=168&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0628&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB628&ddlsponsors=&lsr=16
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=169&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0628&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB628&ddlsponsors=&lsr=16
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=170&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0628&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB628&ddlsponsors=&lsr=16
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=171&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0628&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB628&ddlsponsors=&lsr=16
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=191&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0628&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB628&ddlsponsors=&lsr=16

Bill Comments

feedback