NH HB635 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 266; I. Sec. 4 & 5 Eff: as provided in Sec. 6 II. Rem. Eff: 04/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 266; I. Sec. 4 & 5 Eff: as provided in Sec. 6 II. Rem. Eff: 04/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Enabling a payment in lieu of taxes for a combined heat and power agricultural facility.
Title
Enabling a payment in lieu of taxes for a combined heat and power agricultural facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Laflamme [D] | Rep. William Hatch [D] | Rep. Henry Noel [D] | Rep. Yvonne Thomas [D] |
Rep. Edith Tucker [D] | Sen. David Starr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 266; I. Sec. 4 & 5 Eff: as provided in Sec. 6 II. Rem. Eff: 04/01/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2454e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 19 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2454e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Hearing: 05/08/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 6 |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Municipal and County Government 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 74 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 74 |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 19 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 23 |