NH HB640 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB640
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2839h (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2839h (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a registration fee for canoes and kayaks.
Title
Establishing a registration fee for canoes and kayaks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2839h (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-18 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-09-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-02-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB640 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2839h (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)