NH HB641 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB641
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to high school students participating in New Hampshire's dual and concurrent enrollment program and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to high school students participating in New Hampshire's dual and concurrent enrollment program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Terry Wolf [R] | Rep. James Grenier [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] |
Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. Mary Gile [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 35 |
2017-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-19 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-09-21 | House | Retained Bill Division II Work Session: 09/28/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-09-20 | House | Retained Bill Division II Work Session: 09/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-03-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-23 | House | Division II Work Session: 02/28/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-02-21 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/02/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Finance 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 31 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0369h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 31 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment # 2017-0369h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 31 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0369h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 17-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 18 |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB641 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar)