NH HB646 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to labeling, signage, and restrictions on the sales and use of bee-toxic pesticides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to labeling, signage, and restrictions on the sales and use of bee-toxic pesticides.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-11-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar)
2019-10-11HouseExecutive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-10-04HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-09-17HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/08/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-19HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback