NH HB647 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB647
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2860h (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2860h (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to lucky 7 tickets.
Title
Relative to lucky 7 tickets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2860h (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/05/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-22 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB647 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2860h (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar)