NH HB647 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB647

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to lucky 7 tickets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to lucky 7 tickets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - Remove from Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-16SenateVacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7
2020-01-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2860h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 55
2020-01-09HouseAmendment # 2019-2860h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 55
2019-11-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2860h (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 32
2019-10-22HouseFull Committee Work Session: 11/05/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-10-02HouseExecutive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-10-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-22HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-29House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-23House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 23

Same As/Similar To

HB647 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2860h (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback