NH HB649 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 36; Eff: 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 36; Eff: 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to consumer credit corrections, consumer credit protection from fraud, and consumer credit regulatory reform.
Title
Relative to consumer credit corrections, consumer credit protection from fraud, and consumer credit regulatory reform.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 36; Eff: 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 42 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1563e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 127 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1563e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/18/2019); Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 5 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 23 |