NH HB650 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - House Signed By Governor 06/27/2011; I. Section 2 Effective 07/01/2012; II. Remainder Effective 06/27/2011; Chapter 0211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a school district to call a special meeting in the event of changes in the amount of state education funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing a school district to call a special meeting in the event of changes in the amount of state education funding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-27 House Signed By Governor 06/27/2011; I. Section 2 Effective 07/01/2012; II. Remainder Effective 06/27/2011; Chapter 0211
2011-06-08 House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1728
2011-06-08 Senate Enrolled
2011-06-08 House House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2227s (Rep L.Ober): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1720
2011-06-01 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 19, Pg.540
2011-06-01 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2227s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 19, Pg.524
2011-06-01 Senate Sen. Stiles Floor Amendment #2011-2227s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.524
2011-06-01 Senate Committee Amendment 1607s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.523
2011-06-01 Senate Sen. Stiles Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.522
2011-05-04 Senate Sen. Kelly Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.300
2011-05-04 Senate Committee Amendment 1607s, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 15
2011-04-28 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1607s, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22
2011-04-06 Senate Hearing: 4/12/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 19
2011-03-23 Senate Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11, Pg.194
2011-03-15 House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.739
2011-03-09 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.541
2011-03-04 House Continued Public Hearing: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 ==Executive Session To Follow==
2011-03-02 House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/4/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2011-03-02 House Public Hearing: 3/4/2011 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 ==RECESSED==
2011-02-23 House Introduced and Referred to Special Committee on Education Funding Reform; House Journal 21, PG.520
2011-02-23 House Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by House Feb 15, 2011: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.520

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback