NH HB650 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0294h for Jan 8 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Making an appropriation to start a bus service between Claremont and Lebanon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making an appropriation to start a bus service between Claremont and Lebanon.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0294h for Jan 8 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-15House==TIME CHANGE==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2013-10-15HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/29/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2013-09-10HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/25/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2013-02-19HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2013-02-07HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2013 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG.204

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback