NH HB650 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-124; House Journal 24, PG. 856-858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring background checks for commercial firearms sales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring background checks for commercial firearms sales.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-11 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 236 N: 124 NV: 36 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-124; House Journal 24, PG. 856-858
2015-03-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2015-03-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 418-419
2015-02-25HouseExecutive Session: 3/2/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-02-11HousePublic Hearing: 2/19/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201-203
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 234

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback