NH HB655 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB655
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulating disorderly houses.
Title
Regulating disorderly houses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - House - ITL (Y: 188 N: 180 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 178 N: 188 NV: 6 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2020-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 178 N: 188 NV: 6 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-01-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 34 |
2020-01-09 | House | Reconsider (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted DV 185-173 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 34 |
2020-01-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-180 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 26 |
2020-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2733h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 178-188 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 26 |
2020-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2019-2733h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 26 |
2019-11-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2733h (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 28 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-08-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-08-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-06-11 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-03-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB655 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate