NH HB656 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 267; Eff: 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 267; Eff: 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the impact of financial initiatives for commercially insured members by drug manufacturers on prescription drug prices and health insurance premiums.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the impact of financial initiatives for commercially insured members by drug manufacturers on prescription drug prices and health insurance premiums.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 267; Eff: 07/19/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2389s (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 2 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2389s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Morgan Floor Amendment # 2019-2389s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Morgan Moved Ought to Pass; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Morgan Moved to Remove HB 656 from the Consent Calendar; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24A |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Hearing: 05/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 205-131 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 74 |
2019-03-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 21 |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 23 |