NH HB657 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 180; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 180; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prescription drugs under the managed care law.
Title
Relative to prescription drugs under the managed care law.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 180; Eff: 09/08/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2350e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 40 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2350e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 05/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 03:00 pm; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Hearing: 04/25/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0906h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 13 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0906h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 13 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0906h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5 |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 23 |