NH HB661 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - House Interim Study - Executive Session 10/26/2010 10:00 Legislative Office Building 302
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - House Interim Study - Executive Session 10/26/2010 10:00 Legislative Office Building 302
Summary
Relative to family leave insurance.
Title
Relative to family leave insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Rep. Christine Hamm [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Rep. Edward Moran [R] | Rep. James Pilliod [R] | Rep. Carla Skinder [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | House Interim Study - Executive Session 10/26/2010 10:00 Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-09-27 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-06-14 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/22/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-01-06 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.301 | |
2009-11-03 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 Regular Calendar (vote 16-0); House Calendar 2, PG.91 | |
2009-10-02 | House =CANCELLED= Retained Bill - Continued Executive Session If Neeeded: 11/3/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-10-02 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/28/2009 Legislative Office Building 302 1:00 PM or Immediately Following Session | |
2009-10-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2009 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-09-30 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-09-30 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-02-26 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-01-29 | House Executive Session: 2/11/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-01-27 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2009 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.237 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=744&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |