NH HB661 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to record keeping for sold or transferred animals and making certain technical corrections to the law governing the sale or transfer of animals.
Title
Relative to record keeping for sold or transferred animals and making certain technical corrections to the law governing the sale or transfer of animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Hearing: 03/16/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-01-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2508h: Motion Adopted DV 158-151 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 11 |
2016-01-07 | House | Amendment #2015-2508h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 11 |
2015-11-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2559h (NT) |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2508h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 6-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 21-22 |
2015-10-21 | House | ==CONTINUED==Executive Session: 10/29/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-10-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 10/29/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-10-07 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306==Recessed== |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-05-26 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-05-12 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-05-05 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-03-03 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/2/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 234 |