NH HB661 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB661
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to claims for medical monitoring.
Title
Relative to claims for medical monitoring.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2766h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 131 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2766h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 131 |
2019-11-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2766h (NT) (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 |
2019-10-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-09-24 | House | Executive Session: 10/29/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-08-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-06-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-06-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/11/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-03-14 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-02-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 24 |
Same As/Similar To
HB661 (Carry Over) 2019-11-05 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate