NH HB664 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 241-132 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to vehicle repair standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to vehicle repair standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 241 N: 132 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 247 N: 101 NV: 17 Abs: 35) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18HouseVeto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 241-132 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 52
2019-08-21HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 08/15/2019
2019-07-29HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 59
2019-07-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-09HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2636e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 55
2019-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2636e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2455s (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 2
2019-06-06SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2455s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19
2019-06-06SenateSen. Cavanaugh Floor Amendment # 2019-2455s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19
2019-06-06SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved Ought to Pass; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19
2019-06-06SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 06/06/2019; Senate Calendar 25
2019-05-30SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateSpecial Order to the end of the calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0904h: Motion Adopted DV 242-105 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 74
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0904h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 247-101 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 74
2019-03-13HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-13HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0904h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 21
2019-03-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-28House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-27HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback