NH HB671 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB671
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to pharmacy benefit manager business practices, licensure, and transparency.
Title
Relative to pharmacy benefit manager business practices, licensure, and transparency.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-08-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 25 |
Same As/Similar To
HB671 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)