NH HB675 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 38; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the purchase of service credit in the state retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the purchase of service credit in the state retirement system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 38; Eff: 07/14/2019
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); Senate Journal 15
2019-04-25HouseEnrolled 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 127
2019-04-11SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-19SenateHearing: 04/03/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 13
2019-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 9
2019-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback