NH HB684 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 59; Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 59; Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to mediation of rent increases in manufactured housing parks.
Title
Relative to mediation of rent increases in manufactured housing parks.
Sponsors
Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 59; Eff: 07/01/2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/25/2019; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0892h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 15 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0892h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 15 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0892h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6 |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 25 |