NH HB685 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB685

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 195-139 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to insurance plans that cover maternity benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to insurance plans that cover maternity benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-17 - House - Veto Override (Y: 0 N: 12 NV: 343 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 196 N: 132 NV: 24 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseVeto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 195-139 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
2020-08-10HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 08/07/2020
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 196-132 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 10
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1468s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1468s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1468s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-05SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate5. Webinar ID: 940 7264 6718 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13017158592,,94072646718# or 13126266799,,94072646718# Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_croAzCD-TXuZDPa4hQt2XQ Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 10:40 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1364s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 10:35 am; Senate Calendar 22
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7
2020-01-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2779h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 63
2020-01-08HouseAmendment # 2019-2779h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 63
2019-11-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2779h (NT) (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 18
2019-10-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-10-16HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-09-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-09-11HouseExecutive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-08-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-06-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-08HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-27HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 25

Same As/Similar To

HB685 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2779h (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=531&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB685
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=512&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=512
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=512
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=64&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB0685&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB685&ddlsponsors=&lsr=531
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=65&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB0685&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB685&ddlsponsors=&lsr=531
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=179&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB0685&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB685&ddlsponsors=&lsr=531
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=209&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB0685&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB685&ddlsponsors=&lsr=531

Bill Comments

feedback