NH HB694 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Lay on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Lay on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a take-back program for illegal controlled drugs.
Title
Establishing a take-back program for illegal controlled drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dolan [R] | Rep. Douglas Thomas [R] | Rep. Joe Alexander [R] | Rep. Bob Greene [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 14 |
2019-03-07 | House | Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60 |
2019-03-07 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Dolan) 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 3 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5 |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-20 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-13 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 26 |