NH HB695 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transparency of nonprofit patient advocacy organizations.
Title
Relative to transparency of nonprofit patient advocacy organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 05/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 02:45 pm; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Hearing: 04/25/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0761h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0761h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0761h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6 |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 26 |