NH HB697 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Medicare for all.
Title
Relative to Medicare for all.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 6 |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 4 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 26 |