NH HB699 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to discounts for OHRV and snowmobile registration.
Title
Relative to discounts for OHRV and snowmobile registration.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Alan Bershtein [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 14 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 9 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 3 P. 26 |