NH HB702 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB702
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requirements for supervised visitation centers.
Title
Relative to requirements for supervised visitation centers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Plumer [R] | Rep. Harry Viens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 8 |
2020-05-07 | House | Executive Session: 05/14/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/96270479183 |
2020-03-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2813h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 61 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2813h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 61 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 61 |
2019-10-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-10-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2813h (NT) (Vote 11-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 17 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 27 |
Same As/Similar To
HB702 (Carry Over) 2019-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate