NH HB706 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing an independent redistricting commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an independent redistricting commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - OTPA (Y: 218 N: 123 NV: 14 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12HouseVetoed by Governor Sununu 08/09/2019
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2026s (Rep. Moynihan): Motion Adopted DV 208-137 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 3
2019-05-24SenateSpecial Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2026s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2026s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to after Executive Departments and Administration, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the beginning of Election Law and Municipal Affairs, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2026s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-25SenateHearing: 05/01/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-28HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0597h and 2019-0699h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-123 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 45
2019-02-28HouseFLAM # 2019-0699h (Rep. Ley): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 45
2019-02-28HouseAmendment # 2019-0597h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 42
2019-02-27HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Boehm) 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 2
2019-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0597h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 7
2019-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2019 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 27

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback